Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/22/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/22/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/22/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/22/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/27/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/27/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/28/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/12/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/18/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/30/2004