Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/30/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 04/02/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/22/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/22/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/22/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/22/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/05/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/05/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/05/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/05/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/05/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/05/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/05/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/05/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/11/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/11/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/17/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/17/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/20/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/20/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/08/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/08/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/08/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/08/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/17/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/17/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/17/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/17/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/24/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/08/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/08/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/14/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/19/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/19/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/20/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/22/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/08/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/08/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/08/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/08/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/09/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/09/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/14/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/23/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/28/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/28/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/29/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/04/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/04/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/06/2004