Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/30/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/21/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/21/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/21/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/21/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/21/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/21/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/28/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/28/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/04/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/05/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/02/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/21/2004