Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/31/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/01/2004
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/01/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/01/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/01/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/20/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/20/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/20/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/20/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/24/2004
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/24/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/24/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/24/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/24/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/24/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/24/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/24/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/24/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/24/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/24/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/24/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/24/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/24/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/24/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/24/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/24/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/24/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/24/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/24/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/24/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/24/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/24/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/24/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/24/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/24/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/24/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/20/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/20/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/14/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/30/2004