Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/05/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/05/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/05/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/05/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/05/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/05/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/05/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/05/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/05/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/05/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/05/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/05/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/05/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/05/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/05/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/05/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/05/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/06/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/06/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/06/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/06/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/06/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/06/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/06/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/06/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/06/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/13/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/13/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/13/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/13/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/13/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/13/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/13/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/13/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/13/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/13/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/01/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/01/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/01/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/01/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/01/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/03/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/03/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/14/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/22/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/22/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/22/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/22/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/22/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/06/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/06/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/06/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/06/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/06/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/06/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/06/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/09/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/09/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew