Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/22/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/22/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/22/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/22/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/22/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/22/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/22/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/22/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/06/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/06/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/06/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/06/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/06/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/06/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/06/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/06/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/06/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/19/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/19/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/19/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/19/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/19/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/19/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/19/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/19/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/19/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/19/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/21/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/21/2004
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/21/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/21/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/21/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/21/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/21/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/21/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/29/2004