Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 01/29/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/29/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/05/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/11/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/11/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/25/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/25/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/13/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/13/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/13/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/13/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/18/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/18/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/18/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/18/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/18/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/26/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/26/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/26/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/26/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/27/2003