Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/11/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/18/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/26/2003