Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/11/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/25/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/13/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/20/2003