Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/28/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 01/29/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 01/29/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 02/05/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/11/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/13/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/13/2003
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/25/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/25/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/11/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/13/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/13/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/13/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/13/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/13/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/18/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/20/2003