Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/01/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 04/01/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/22/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/22/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/22/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/22/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/22/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/22/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/27/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/28/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/05/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/05/2004
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/05/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/05/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/05/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/05/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/05/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/18/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/18/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/18/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/18/2004
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/20/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/20/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/01/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/01/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/01/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/16/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/25/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/25/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/25/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/25/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/08/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/09/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/13/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/22/2004