Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/21/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/06/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/06/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/02/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/09/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/09/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/09/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/08/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/16/2004