Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/02/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/02/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 04/02/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/06/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 05/17/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/17/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/08/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 10/07/2004