Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/02/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/02/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/02/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/02/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/02/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/30/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/05/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/05/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/11/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/11/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/11/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/17/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/17/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/18/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/18/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/03/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/21/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/23/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/22/2004