There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2004

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2004

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2004

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2004

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase, effective as of December 1, 2004, the rates of disability compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for survivors of certain service-connected disabled veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
10/25/2004Became Public Law No: 108-363. (TXT | PDF)
10/25/2004Signed by President.
10/13/2004Presented to President.
10/08/2004Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
10/05/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate in lieu of S. 2483 with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/05/2004Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/22/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 0 (Roll no. 408).(text of measure as passed in House: CR 7/20/2004 H6078-6079)
06/03/2004Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 108-524.
04/20/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (30)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/25/2004Became Public Law No: 108-363. (TXT | PDF)
10/25/2004Signed by President.
10/13/2004HousePresented to President.
10/08/2004-11:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/08/2004-11:02pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
10/08/2004-11:01pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9027; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H9027)
10/06/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/05/2004SenateSee also S. 2483.
10/05/2004SenatePassed Senate in lieu of S. 2483 with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/05/2004SenateSenate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 2483.
10/05/2004SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S10459)
10/05/2004SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/07/2004SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/22/2004-12:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 0 (Roll no. 408). (text of measure as passed in House: CR 7/20/2004 H6078-6079)
07/22/2004-12:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/22/2004-12:42pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6579)
07/20/2004-5:55pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/20/2004-5:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4175.
07/20/2004-5:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6078-6080)
07/20/2004-5:39pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/03/2004HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 302.
06/03/2004HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 108-524.
05/19/2004HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/19/2004HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/13/2004HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits
05/13/2004HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits
04/22/2004HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/20/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/20/2004HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E571)
04/20/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs04/20/2004 Referred to
05/19/2004 Markup by
06/03/2004 Reported by H. Rept. 108-524
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits04/22/2004 Referred to
05/13/2004 Markup by
05/13/2004 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs09/07/2004 Referred to
10/05/2004 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4175. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-363 (10/25/2004)

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2004 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to increase, as of December 1, 2004, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled adult children, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children.

Requires each such increase to be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date.