Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/20/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/20/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/20/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/20/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/20/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/20/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/01/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/01/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/17/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/25/2004