Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/21/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/21/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/21/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/22/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/22/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 04/22/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/27/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/04/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/04/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/11/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/11/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/20/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/22/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/22/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/08/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/22/2004