Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/21/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/26/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/15/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/15/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/24/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/24/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/24/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/24/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/25/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/05/2004