Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/11/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/08/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/14/2003