Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/28/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/28/2004
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/06/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/06/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/06/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/06/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/06/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/13/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/18/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/20/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/02/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/02/2004