There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 32, United States Code, to rename the National Guard Challenge Program as the National Guard Youth Challenge Program, to increase the maximum Federal share of the costs of State programs under the National Youth Guard Challenge Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/22/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/25/2004Referred to the Subcommittee on Total Force.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/25/2004Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
04/22/2004Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/22/2004Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/22/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/22/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/22/2004
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/22/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/28/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/28/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/28/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/28/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/04/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/04/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/05/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 05/05/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/05/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/05/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 05/05/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/06/2004
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/13/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/13/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/18/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/09/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/09/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/14/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/08/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/07/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services04/22/2004 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Total Force05/25/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4217.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4217. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/22/2004)

Amends Federal provisions concerning the National Guard Challenge Program (a civilian youth opportunities program conducted by the Secretary of Defense) to: (1) provide a maximum Federal matching funds level of 65 percent of the costs of operating the State program during FY 2005, 70 percent during FY 2006, and 75 percent for FY 2007 and beyond; (2) authorize appropriations for the Program for FY 2005; and (3) rename it the National Guard Youth Challenge Program.