Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/22/2004
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 04/22/2004
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/22/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/28/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/05/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 05/05/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/05/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/06/2004
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/13/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/09/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/08/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/07/2004