There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

High-Performance Computing Revitalization Act of 2004

Short Titles as Introduced

High-Performance Computing Revitalization Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the High-Performance Computing Act of 1991.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/07/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5203-5205)
07/01/2004Reported by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 108-580.
04/27/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/08/2004SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
07/07/2004-10:57amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/07/2004-10:57amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5203-5205)
07/07/2004-10:35amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4218.
07/07/2004-10:35amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5203-5207)
07/07/2004-10:34amHouseMrs. Biggert moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/01/2004HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 344.
07/01/2004HouseReported by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 108-580.
06/25/2004HouseMr. Boehlert asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Science, Space and Technology have until 4:00 p.m. on July 2 to file a report on H.R. 4218. Agreed to without objection.
06/16/2004HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science
06/16/2004HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science
06/04/2004HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1052)
05/13/2004HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Science
04/27/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science.
04/27/2004HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2381-2382)
04/27/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Science04/27/2004 Referred to
05/13/2004 Hearings by
06/16/2004 Markup by
07/01/2004 Reported by H. Rept. 108-580
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/08/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4218.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4218. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (07/01/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

High-Performance Computing Revitalization Act of 2004 - Amends the High-Performance Computing Act of 1991 to direct the President to implement a High-Performance Computing Research and Development Program (current law provides for a National High-Performance Computing Program) and revise program requirements.

Requires the Director of the Office of Science and Technology Policy to: (1) establish the goals and priorities for Federal high-performance computing research, development, networking, and other activities; (2) establish Program Component Areas that implement such goals and identify the Grand Challenges (i.e., fundamental problems in science or engineering, with broad economic and scientific impact, whose solutions will require the application of high-performance computing resources) that the Program should address; and (3) develop and maintain a research, development, and deployment road map for the provision of high-performance computing systems. Eliminates the requirement that the Director provide for interagency coordination of the Program.

Revises requirements for annual reports by requiring that such reports: (1) describe Program Component Areas, including any changes in the definition of or activities under such Areas and the reasons for such changes, and describe Grand Challenges supported under the Program; (2) describe the levels of Federal funding and the levels proposed for each Program Component Area; (3) describe the levels of Federal funding for each agency and department participating in the Program for each such Area; and (4) include an analysis of the extent to which the Program incorporates the recommendations of the advisory committee on high-performance computing. Eliminates the requirement that such reports include reports from the Secretary of Energy on Department of Energy activities taken to carry out the National High-Performance Computing Program.

Requires such advisory committee to: (1) provide the Director with an independent assessment of the balance between components of the Program, including funding levels for the Program Component Areas and whether the research and development undertaken pursuant to the Program is helping to maintain U.S. leadership in high-performance computing and networking; and (2) conduct periodic evaluations of the funding, management, coordination, implementation, and activities of the Program, and report at least once every two fiscal years to specified congressional committees.

Requires the Office of Management and Budget to identify each element of its high-performance computing activities which contributes directly to the Program Component Areas or benefits from the Program.

Repeals requirements under the Act for the National Research and Education Network and the Next Generation Internet.

Modifies provisions regarding responsibilities of the National Science Foundation, the National Aeronautics and Space Administration, the Secretary of Energy, the National Institute of Standards and Technology, the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, and the Environmental Protection Agency.