Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/28/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/25/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/08/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/09/2004