There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4230. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/28/2004)

Global Anti-Semitism Awareness Act of 2004 - Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the United States should continue to support efforts to combat anti-Semitism worldwide through bilateral relationships and interaction with international organizations such as the Organization of Security and Cooperation in Europe (OSCE); (2) the U.S. delegation to the OSCE conference in Berlin should advocate for the appointment of a High Commissioner on anti-Semitism; and (3) the President should direct the United States Ambassador to the United Nations to introduce in the United Nations a measure condemning anti-Semitism.

Amends the State Department Basic Authorities Act of 1956 to authorize and encourage the Secretary of State to establish within the Department of State an Office to Monitor and Combat anti-Semitism.

Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to include in the Department of State annual reports information on: (1) acts of anti-Semitism in foreign countries; and (2) governmental responses to such acts, including efforts to promote anti-bias education. Makes similar amendments to the International Religious Freedom Act of 1998.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/28/2004 Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/28/2004 Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2004 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Titles (2)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced:

Global Anti-Semitism Awareness Act of 2004

Official Titles:

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced:

To authorize the establishment within the Department of State of an Office to Monitor and Combat Anti-Semitism, to require inclusion in annual Department of State reports of information concerning acts of anti-Semitism around the world, and for other purposes.


Subjects (32)

  • Antisemitism
  • Cemeteries and funerals
  • Conferences
  • Congressional reporting requirements
  • Department of State
  • Elementary and secondary education
  • Executive reorganization
  • Government paperwork
  • Human rights
  • International agencies
  • International propaganda
  • Jews
  • Mass media
  • Minorities
  • Multicultural education
  • Nongovernmental organizations
  • Racial violence
  • Racism
  • Religion
  • Religious liberty
  • School buildings
  • Synagogues
  • United Nations
  • Vandalism
  • Violence

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/28/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/05/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/05/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/05/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/05/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/05/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/05/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/05/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/05/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/05/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/05/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/05/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/05/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/13/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/13/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/13/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/13/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/13/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/13/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/20/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/03/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/03/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/22/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/22/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/09/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/08/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations04/28/2004 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.R.4230.