Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/04/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 05/11/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/17/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/01/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/02/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/04/2004