Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/29/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/12/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/12/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/12/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/12/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/12/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/12/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/12/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/12/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/20/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/20/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/20/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/20/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/20/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/25/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/25/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/25/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/25/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/25/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/25/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/25/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/25/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/25/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/09/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/09/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/09/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/09/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/09/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/09/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/09/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/09/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/09/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/09/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/09/2004
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/09/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/09/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/09/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/09/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/09/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/09/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/09/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/09/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/09/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/09/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/09/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/09/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/09/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/15/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/15/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/15/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/15/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/15/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/15/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/15/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/22/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/22/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 07/22/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/22/2004
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/22/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/22/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/22/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/22/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/22/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/22/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/22/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/22/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/22/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/22/2004
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/22/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/09/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/09/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/09/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/09/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/23/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/23/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/23/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/23/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/23/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/23/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/29/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/29/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/29/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/29/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/29/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/29/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/29/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/29/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/29/2004
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/29/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/29/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/29/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/29/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/29/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/29/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/29/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/29/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/05/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/05/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/05/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/05/2004
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/05/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/05/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/05/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/05/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/05/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/05/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/08/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 10/08/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/08/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/08/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/08/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/08/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/08/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/08/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 10/08/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/19/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/19/2004