Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/12/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/12/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/12/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/05/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/05/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/12/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/07/2003