Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/04/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/04/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/06/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/06/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/06/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/06/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/06/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/06/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/06/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/06/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/06/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/06/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/06/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/06/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/13/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/13/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/13/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/13/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/13/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/13/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/13/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/13/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/13/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/13/2004
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/13/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/13/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/13/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/13/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/13/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/13/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/13/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/13/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/13/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/13/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/13/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/13/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/13/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/19/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/19/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/19/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/19/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/19/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/19/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/19/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/19/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/19/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/19/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/19/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/19/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/15/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/15/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/15/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/15/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/15/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/15/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/15/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/15/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/24/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/24/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/24/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/24/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/24/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/24/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/24/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/24/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/24/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/15/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/15/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/15/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/15/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/09/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/09/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/08/2004