There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

Permanent Extension of 10-Percent Individual Income Tax Rate Bracket bill (Identified by CRS)
Ten-Percent Income Tax Rate Bracket Extension bill (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permanently extend the 10-percent individual income tax rate bracket.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
05/13/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 344 - 76 (Roll no. 170).(text: CR H2933)
05/05/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/18/2004SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518.
05/17/2004SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
05/13/2004-1:27pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/13/2004-1:27pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 344 - 76 (Roll no. 170). (text: CR H2933)
05/13/2004-1:10pmHouseH.Amdt.524 On agreeing to the Tanner amendment (A001) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 190 - 227 (Roll no. 169).
05/13/2004-12:49pmHouseH.Amdt.524 The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A001) and the bill pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H2948)
05/13/2004-11:58amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on the Tanner amendment in the nature of a substitute.
05/13/2004-11:57amHouseH.Amdt.524 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Tanner. (consideration: CR H2941-2949; text: CR H2941-2942)
05/13/2004-10:57amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4275.
05/13/2004-10:57amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4275 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order.
05/13/2004-10:57amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 637. (consideration: CR H2933-2949)
05/12/2004-12:28pmHouseRule H. Res. 637 passed House.
05/11/2004-8:01pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 637 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4275 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order.
05/05/2004HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
05/05/2004HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (78)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/05/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/11/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/11/2004
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/11/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/11/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/11/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/11/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/11/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/11/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/11/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/11/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/11/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/11/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/11/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/11/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/11/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/11/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/11/2004
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/11/2004
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/11/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/11/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/11/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/11/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/12/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/05/2004 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4275. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/13/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the increased upper limit amounts for the ten percent income tax rate bracket for individual taxpayers ($14,000 for married taxpayers filing joint tax returns and surviving spouses, $10,000 for heads of household, and $7,000 for unmarried individuals and married individuals filing separately). Allows an inflation adjustment to such amounts for married taxpayers filing joint tax returns, surviving spouses, and heads of household for taxable years beginning after 2003 based on the difference from the Consumer Price Index for 2002.