Refine your search

9 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
10/25/2004 Became Public Law No: 108-364.
10/25/2004 Signed by President.
10/13/2004 Presented to President.
10/08/2004 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2004 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/30/2004 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/14/2004 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3913-3918)
06/01/2004 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 108-514.
05/05/2004 Introduced in House