Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/05/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 05/05/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/11/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/17/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/17/2004
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/17/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/17/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/17/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/02/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/09/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/15/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/15/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/15/2004
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/16/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/24/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/24/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/06/2004
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/06/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/06/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/06/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/06/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/07/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/07/2004
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/07/2004
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/07/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/07/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/09/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/09/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/14/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/14/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/14/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/14/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/14/2004
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/21/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/21/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/09/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/09/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/09/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/09/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/09/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/21/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 12/07/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/07/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/07/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/07/2004