Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/06/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/06/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/06/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/16/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/16/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/16/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/25/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/07/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/15/2004