Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/28/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/28/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 02/05/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/05/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/05/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/05/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/11/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 02/11/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/11/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/11/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/11/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 02/27/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/27/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/27/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/27/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/27/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/27/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 02/27/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/13/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/13/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/13/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/13/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/20/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/20/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/20/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/01/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/01/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/01/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/01/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/01/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/11/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/11/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/07/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/07/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/22/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/05/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/05/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/18/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/15/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/15/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/02/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/02/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/08/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/08/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/21/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/21/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/21/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/21/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 11/21/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/21/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 01/21/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/16/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/16/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/28/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/21/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/22/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/22/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/22/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/08/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/22/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/22/2004
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/07/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/07/2004