Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/17/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/18/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/18/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/18/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/19/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/19/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/19/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/19/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/19/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/20/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/20/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/01/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/01/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/03/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/03/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/03/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/09/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/14/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/14/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/14/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/14/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/14/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/14/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/15/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/16/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/16/2004
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/16/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/18/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/06/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/07/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/07/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/09/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/21/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/07/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/07/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/07/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/07/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/07/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/14/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/21/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/22/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/22/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/22/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/22/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/22/2004
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/22/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/22/2004