Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/12/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/12/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/17/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/19/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/08/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/08/2004
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/08/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/09/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/14/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/14/2004
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/14/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/15/2004
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 06/15/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/23/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/24/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/14/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/07/2004
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/07/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/13/2004
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/21/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/28/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/30/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/07/2004
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/08/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 11/18/2004