There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Business Health Insurance Promotion Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide tax subsidies to encourage small employers to offer affordable health coverage to their employees through qualified health pooling arrangements, to encourage the establishment and operation of these arrangements, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/12/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
06/25/2004Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
05/21/2004Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/14/2004Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E843)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/2004Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/2004Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/2004Referred to House Ways and Means
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/2004Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/2004Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (103)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/12/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/12/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/13/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/13/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/13/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/13/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/17/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/20/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/03/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/03/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/08/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/08/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/08/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/09/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/13/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/22/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/14/2004

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/12/2004 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce05/12/2004 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/21/2004 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce05/12/2004 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations06/25/2004 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4356.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4356. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/12/2004)

Small Business Health Insurance Promotion Act of 2004 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow certain small employers (not more than 50 employees) a business tax credit equal to 50 percent of amounts paid by such employers for the health care coverage of their employees under a qualified health pooling arrangement. Limits the period during which the tax credit may be taken to four years from the date the employer begins participating in a qualified health pooling arrangement. Defines "qualified health pooling arrangement" as a national or state arrangement that provides health benefits coverage substantially similar to that of the four largest health benefit plans offered to Federal employees.

Directs the Secretaries of Health and Human Services and Labor to provide for the offering and oversight of qualified State and national health pooling arrangements and to conduct a study, through the Institute of Medicine of the National Academy of Sciences, of the operation of such arrangements.