Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/12/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/12/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/12/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/13/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/13/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/13/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/13/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/17/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/20/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/03/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/03/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/08/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/08/2004
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/08/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/09/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/13/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/22/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/14/2004