There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Resuming Education After Defense Service Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide entitlement to educational assistance under the Montgomery GI Bill for members of the Selected Reserve who aggregate more than 2 years of active duty service in any five year period, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/13/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
07/14/2004Referred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/14/2004Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E859-860)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2004Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2004Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2004Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/2004Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/02/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/16/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/16/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/16/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/16/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/16/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/18/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/18/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/18/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/23/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/21/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 07/21/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/21/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/21/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/21/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/21/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/21/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/21/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/22/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/22/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/08/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/08/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/08/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/08/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/08/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/08/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/14/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/14/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/14/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/23/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/23/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/07/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/07/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/07/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/07/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/07/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/07/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/07/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/07/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/07/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/07/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/07/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/07/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/07/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/07/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/07/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/07/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/09/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/09/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/09/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/09/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/17/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/20/2004

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/13/2004 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits07/14/2004 Referred to
House Armed Services05/13/2004 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4367. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/13/2004)

Resuming Education After Defense Service Act of 2004 - Makes eligible for basic educational assistance under the Montgomery GI Bill a member of the Selected Reserve who (among other qualifications), during the period beginning on September 11, 2001, and ending on December 31, 2006, serves on active duty in the Armed Forces for one or more periods aggregating not less than two years. Entitles such individuals to one month of educational assistance for each month served on active duty. Makes the amount of such assistance equivalent to that provided for active-duty personnel who have served a minimum of two years of active duty.

Requires the Secretaries of the military departments concerned to inform eligible Selected Reserve personnel of such entitlement.