There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Public Servant Retirement Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title II of the Social Security Act to repeal the windfall elimination provision and protect the retirement of public servants.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/19/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
07/20/2004Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security
06/01/2004Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/19/2004Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/19/2004Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/19/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/19/2004
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/19/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/19/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/19/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/20/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/20/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/20/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/20/2004
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/20/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/20/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/20/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/20/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/02/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/02/2004
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/03/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/09/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 06/09/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/09/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/17/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/17/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/21/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/22/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/22/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/22/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/23/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/23/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/23/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/25/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/25/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/06/2004
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/06/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/06/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/06/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/06/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/06/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/06/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/09/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/13/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/13/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/15/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/20/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/08/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/08/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/29/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/18/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/18/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/18/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/19/2004 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security06/01/2004 Referred to
07/20/2004 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4391. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/19/2004)

Public Servant Retirement Protection Act - Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act (SSA) to repeal the current windfall elimination provisions (which reduce Social Security benefits of retirees who paid into the Social Security system for part of their careers and who also receive a government pension from work in the public sector not covered by Social Security) and to replace them with a formula that treats non-Social Security earnings as if they were Social Security earnings for the purpose of calculating lifetime earnings for certain individuals.