Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 05/19/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/19/2004
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/19/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/19/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/19/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/20/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/20/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/20/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/20/2004
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/20/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/20/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/20/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/20/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/02/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/02/2004
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/03/2004
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/09/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 06/09/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/09/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/17/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/17/2004
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/21/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/22/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/22/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/22/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/23/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/23/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/23/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/25/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/25/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/06/2004
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/06/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/06/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/06/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/06/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/06/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/06/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/09/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/13/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/13/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/15/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/15/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/20/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/08/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/08/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/29/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/18/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/18/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/18/2004