Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/05/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/05/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/05/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/05/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/05/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/13/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/25/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/25/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/11/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/11/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/11/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/11/2003