Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/29/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/11/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/11/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/11/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/13/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/13/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/13/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/13/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/13/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/26/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/26/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/26/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/26/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/26/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/26/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/26/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/26/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/26/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/26/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/26/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/26/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/27/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/04/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/04/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/04/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/04/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/04/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/04/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/04/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/04/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/04/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/04/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/04/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/04/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/05/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/12/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 03/13/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/31/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/01/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/01/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/29/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/09/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/05/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/11/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/24/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/27/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/20/2004