There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Legal Expense Equity Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend chapter 85 of title 28, United States Code, to provide for greater fairness in legal fees payable in civil diversity litigation after an offer of settlement.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/20/2004Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/28/2004Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, the Internet, and Intellectual Property.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/20/2004Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/20/2004Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 05/20/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/20/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/17/2004
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/17/2004
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/17/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/17/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/21/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/21/2004
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/24/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/24/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/09/2004
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/09/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/09/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/09/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/09/2004
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/13/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/13/2004
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/07/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/20/2004 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, the Internet, and Intellectual Property06/28/2004 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4430. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/20/2004)

Legal Expense Equity Act of 2004 - Amends the Federal judicial code to authorize parties in civil diversity litigation to serve written settlement offers on an adverse party at any time not less than 10 days before trial.

Authorizes the court, at any time before judgment is entered, to exempt from settlement any claim that presents a novel and important question of law or fact that substantially affects nonparties. Voids all settlement offers made by the parties with respect to such exempted claims.

Authorizes an offeror whose proposed settlement was declined by an offeree to file a petition with the court seeking payment by the offeree of costs and fees, including attorney's fees, from the date of the last settlement offer by either party if the ultimate judgment or order is not more favorable to the offeree than the proposed settlement. Requires the court to order payment by the offeree in such circumstances unless requiring payment would be manifestly unjust.

Limits attorney's fees ordered under this Act to: (1) the actual attorney's fees incurred by the offeree in connection with the claim; or (2) if no such cost was incurred due to a contingency fee agreement, a reasonable cost that would have been incurred by the offeree absent a contingency fee agreement.

States that this Act does not apply to claims seeking equitable remedies.