Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/18/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/18/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/18/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/08/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/13/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/19/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/19/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/08/2004