Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/20/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/04/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/04/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/04/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/04/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/04/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/04/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/04/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/04/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/04/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 06/23/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/23/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/23/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/23/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/24/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 07/20/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/20/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/20/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/20/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/20/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/20/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/21/2004
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/22/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/22/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 09/07/2004
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/07/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/07/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/07/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/09/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/09/2004
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/09/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/09/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/14/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/14/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/14/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/14/2004
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/23/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/23/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/23/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/23/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/23/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/23/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/23/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/23/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/23/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 09/23/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/28/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 09/28/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/28/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/05/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 10/05/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/05/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/05/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/05/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/05/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/05/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/05/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/05/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/05/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/05/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/05/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/05/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/07/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/07/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/07/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/07/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/08/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/08/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/08/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/08/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/17/2004
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 11/17/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/17/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/17/2004