Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 01/29/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/29/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/05/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 02/05/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/11/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/05/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/06/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 03/06/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/06/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/06/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/12/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/12/2003