Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 01/29/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 01/29/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/29/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/29/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/02/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/29/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/24/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/15/2004