Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 06/02/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/16/2004
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/16/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/16/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/16/2004
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/25/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/25/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/25/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/25/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/25/2004
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/09/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/09/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/09/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/09/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/09/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/15/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/15/2004
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/22/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/22/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/22/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/22/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/22/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/07/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/07/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/07/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/07/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/07/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/07/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/07/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/07/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/07/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/07/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/15/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/15/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/15/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/15/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/15/2004
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/15/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/15/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/15/2004
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/15/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/15/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/15/2004
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/23/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/23/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/23/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/23/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/23/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/23/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/30/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/30/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/30/2004
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/30/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/30/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/30/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/30/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/30/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/30/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/30/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 09/30/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/30/2004
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/30/2004
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/30/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/30/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/06/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/06/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/06/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/06/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/06/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/06/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/06/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/06/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/06/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/06/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/06/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/06/2004
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/06/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/08/2004
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/08/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/08/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/08/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/08/2004
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/08/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 10/08/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/08/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/08/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/08/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/08/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/08/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/16/2004
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/16/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/16/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/16/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/16/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/16/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/17/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/17/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/17/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/18/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/18/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/06/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/06/2004