Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 06/03/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/03/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/03/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/03/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/03/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/03/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/08/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/09/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/25/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/12/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/28/2004